+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 2:16 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1155
- Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2014-442.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1045
- Third Reading Passed
- County and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered
- Engrossed
- Hill Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1046
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1047
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1155
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 9
April 2, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 10
April 1, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1045
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 3
April 1, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1046
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor