+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Health
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Health first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 373
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 374
- Engrossed
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 373
- Yeas: 86
April 10, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 374
- Yeas: 91
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor