+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1322
- Third Reading Passed
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 273
- Third Reading Passed
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2017: Roll 1322
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
March 14, 2017: Roll 273
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor