+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-229)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Delivered to Governor at 4:52 p.m. on March 6, 2018.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 598
- Third Reading Passed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2018-229.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Whatley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Mobile County
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 287
- Third Reading Passed
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2018: Roll 598
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
February 13, 2018: Roll 287
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 73
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor