+ − Effective Date
- April 14, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Forwarded to Governor on April 7, 2022 at 10:45 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2022-406.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1041
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 630
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Vote
April 6, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1041 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor