+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 7, 2024 in the House:
- Enacted
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Ready to Enroll
- Enrolled
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 863
On April 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On April 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on State Governmental Affairs
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 542
On April 4, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 3, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 30, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 863 Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 11, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 1
April 11, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 542 Vote
- Yeas: 103
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor