+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor at 11:54 a.m. on May 19, 2017.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Givan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1004
- Concurrence Requested
- Assigned Act No. 2017-439.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1128
- Local Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1126
- Local Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1127
- Local Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Local Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
- Local Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1130
- Local Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1131
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1132
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1129
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 6 amendments
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Givan Amendment #2 Offered
- Givan motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 149
- Engrossed
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 150
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 134
- Third Reading Passed
- Jefferson County Legislation Amendment #1 offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 133
- Jefferson County Legislation Amendment #2 Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 135
- Jefferson County Legislation Amendment #3 Offered
- Givan Amendment #1 Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 136
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 137
- Givan Notice in Writing filed
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (15)
May 19, 2017: Roll 1004
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 43
May 17, 2017: Roll 1126
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 13
May 17, 2017: Roll 1127
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 13
May 17, 2017: Roll 1128
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 13
May 17, 2017: Roll 1129
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 13
May 17, 2017: Roll 1130
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 13
May 17, 2017: Roll 1131
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 13
May 17, 2017: Roll 1132
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 13
March 7, 2017: Roll 149
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 56
March 7, 2017: Roll 150
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 63
March 2, 2017: Roll 135
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 80
March 2, 2017: Roll 133
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 75
March 2, 2017: Roll 137
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 70
March 2, 2017: Roll 136
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 74
March 2, 2017: Roll 134
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 74
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor