+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-241)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-241.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Ledbetter motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 728
- Concurrence Requested
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 617
- Figures Amendment Offered
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 618
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Scott intended to vote "Yea"
- Cosponsors Added
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 217
- Third Reading Passed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Education Policy as Favorable
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (5)
May 15, 2019: Roll 728
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
May 7, 2019: Roll 617
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 7
May 7, 2019: Roll 618
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
April 16, 2019: Roll 217
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 3
April 16, 2019: Roll 218
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor