+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 700
- Third Reading Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee on Local Legislation
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 250
- Third Reading Passed
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2016: Roll 700
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
March 8, 2016: Roll 250
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 36
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor