+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 648
- Third Reading Passed
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 11
March 6, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 648
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor