+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1313
- Third Reading Passed
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 944
- Third Reading Passed
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2017: Roll 1313
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 12
May 17, 2017: Roll 944
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 90
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor