+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- Enacted
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Ready to Enroll
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 890
On April 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Judiciary Engrossed Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 631
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 632
- Engrossed
On April 4, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 3, 2024 in the House:
- Judiciary 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On March 19, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 30, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 890 Vote
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
April 16, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 16, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 631 Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 632 Vote
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor