+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 969
- Signature Requested
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 633
- Third Reading Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2016: Roll 969
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
April 19, 2016: Roll 633
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
April 19, 2016: Roll 634
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 8