+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Ethics and Campaign Finance first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 480
- Bracy Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 481
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 482
- Engrossed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2017: Roll 480
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 7
April 11, 2017: Roll 481
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
April 11, 2017: Roll 482
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
March 14, 2017: Roll 310
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor