+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 314
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 313
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 17, 2016: Roll 313
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
March 17, 2016: Roll 314
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 4
February 24, 2016: Roll 88
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 4
February 11, 2016: Roll 25
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor