+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Judiciary
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 139
- Third Reading Passed
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 6
February 4, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 139
- Yeas: 82
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor