+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 843
- Glover motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 90
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 89
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2017: Roll 843
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
February 23, 2017: Roll 89
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 12
February 23, 2017: Roll 90
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor