+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Health
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 357
- Third Reading Passed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
+ − Vote
April 9, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 357
- Yeas: 97
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor