+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on April 13, 2017.
- Assigned Act No. 2017-166.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 499
- Third Reading Passed
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Whatley motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 242
- Third Reading Passed
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Tuscaloosa County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2017: Roll 499
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 13
March 14, 2017: Roll 242
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 81
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor