+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 7, 2024 in the House:
- Enacted
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Ready to Enroll
- Enrolled
On April 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 773
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 9, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 445
On April 4, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 3, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On March 19, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 25, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 25, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 773 Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 9, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 3
April 9, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 445 Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor