+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2013-373.
- Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1094
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 1014
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
- Smitherman motion to rerefer
- Williams motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 711
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Commerce and Small Business first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 879
- Hill Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 880
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 881
- Engrossed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1094
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 1
May 9, 2013: Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 1014
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
May 2, 2013: Williams motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 711
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 8
April 25, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 879
- Yeas: 95
April 25, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 880
- Yeas: 93
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor