+ − Effective Date
- July 01, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Assigned Act No. 2022-290.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Shelnutt Amendment Offered
- Motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 1056
- Shelnutt motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1057
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1058
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Kitchens motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 977
- Givan motion challenging Rule 25 interpretation
- Stadthagen motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 978
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Delivered to Governor at 9:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 285
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2022: Shelnutt motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1057 Vote
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 5
April 7, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1058 Vote
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
April 7, 2022: Givan motion challenging Rule 25 interpretation Vote
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
April 7, 2022: Kitchens motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 977 Vote
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor