+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 7:22 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
- Assigned Act No. 2014-330.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1078
- Pittman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1077
- Pittman Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Payne and Hurst intended to vote "Yea"
- Cosponsors Added
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 589
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 588
- Poole Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 587
- Education Policy first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1078
- Yeas: 29
April 1, 2014: Pittman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1077
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 27
March 5, 2014: Cosponsors Added
- Yeas: 65
March 5, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 587
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
March 5, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 588
- Yeas: 91
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor