+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-456)
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-456.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1469
- Third Reading Passed
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 685
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 684
- Boyd Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred from EP to Health
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2019: Roll 1469
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
May 14, 2019: Roll 684
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 6
May 14, 2019: Roll 685
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor