+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-519.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 58
- Third Reading Passed
- Williams motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 19
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
+ − Votes (2)
August 10, 2015: Roll 58
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
August 5, 2015: Roll 19
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor