+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-470)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
- Assigned Act No. 2018-470.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1044
- Third Reading Passed
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 754
- Third Reading Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2018: Roll 1044
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
March 13, 2018: Roll 754
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor