+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- Enacted
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Ready to Enroll
- Enrolled
On April 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Transportation and Energy 1st Amendment Offered
- Carried Over to the Call of the Chair
- Transportation and Energy 1st Amendment Offered
- Allen motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 753
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 754
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Transportation and Energy 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Transportation and Energy
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Public Safety and Homeland Security Engrossed Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 372
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 373
- Engrossed
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On March 20, 2024 in the House:
- Public Safety and Homeland Security 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 25, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
April 25, 2024: Allen motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 753 Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 25, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 754 Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 2, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
April 2, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 372 Vote
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
April 2, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 373 Vote
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor