+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (3)
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Indefinitely Postponed
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2017: Roll 492
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 11
April 11, 2017: Roll 519
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
April 11, 2017: Roll 520
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 7
February 28, 2017: Roll 102
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 7
February 28, 2017: Roll 103
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor