+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 7, 2024 in the House:
- Enacted
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 7, 2024 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Sent to Secretary of State
- Delivered to Governor
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Ready to Enroll
- Enrolled
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1008
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 584
- LocalCertificationResolutionAdopted
On April 9, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Votes (5)
May 2, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
May 2, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1008 Vote
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
April 16, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 26
April 16, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 584 Vote
- Yeas: 66
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 33
April 16, 2024: LocalCertificationResolutionAdopted Vote
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor