+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-462)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
- Assigned Act No. 2018-462.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1003
- Third Reading Passed
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 262
- Third Reading Passed
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2018: Roll 1003
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
February 8, 2018: Roll 262
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor