+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 24, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On August 23, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Gaston motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 52
- Concurrence Requested
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 46
- Third Reading Passed
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 41
- Tourism and Marketing Amendment Offered
- Dial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing
On August 17, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 24
- Third Reading Passed
On August 16, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
+ − Votes (4)
August 23, 2016: Roll 46
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
August 23, 2016: Roll 52
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 10
August 19, 2016: Roll 41
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 16
August 17, 2016: Roll 24
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor