+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-410)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:17 a.m. on March 22, 2018.
- Assigned Act No. 2018-410.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 935
- Third Reading Passed
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 405
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 404
- Hill Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (3)
March 21, 2018: Roll 935
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
February 20, 2018: Roll 404
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 18
February 20, 2018: Roll 405
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor