+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-416)
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acted on by Tourism as Favorable
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-416.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1400
- Third Reading Passed
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Rereferred to Committee on Tourism
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1005
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1004
- Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2019: Roll 1400
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
May 23, 2019: Roll 1004
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 15
May 23, 2019: Roll 1005
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor