+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 731
- Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 246
- Third Reading Passed
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 20, 2016: Roll 731
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
March 8, 2016: Roll 246
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 66
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor