+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on April 30, 2015 at 2:05 p.m. on April 30, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-117.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 665
- Third Reading Passed
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 163
- Third Reading Passed
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2015: Roll 665
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
March 31, 2015: Roll 163
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 66
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor