+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-506)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Concurrence Requested
- Williams (JD) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1088
- Delivered to Governor at 6:10 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2018-506.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1185
- Ward Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1186
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Judiciary first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1074
- Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 2 amendments
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Tuggle intended to vote "Yea"
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Cosponsors Added
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 737
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 736
- Judiciary first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 28, 2018: Roll 1088
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
March 27, 2018: Roll 1185
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
March 27, 2018: Roll 1186
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
March 22, 2018: Roll 1074
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
March 13, 2018: Roll 736
- Yeas: 102
March 13, 2018: Roll 737
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 1
March 13, 2018: Roll 738
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor