+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 619
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 157
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (3)
April 28, 2016: Roll 884
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 19, 2016: Roll 619
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
March 1, 2016: Roll 157
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 91
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor