+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Singleton motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Waggoner Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing
On August 18, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 36
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 35
- Scott Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Faulkner motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On August 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
August 19, 2016: Roll 26
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 6
August 19, 2016: Roll 25
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 6
August 19, 2016: Roll 27
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 3
August 18, 2016: Roll 20
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 6
August 18, 2016: Roll 36
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 4
August 18, 2016: Roll 21
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
August 18, 2016: Roll 35
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 27
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor