+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 11, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-557)
On November 3, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2021-557.
- Forwarded to Governor on November 3, 2021 at 2:10 p.m. on November 3, 2021.
On November 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On November 3, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On November 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 28
On November 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On November 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 11
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On October 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
+ − Votes (2)
November 3, 2021: Roll 28
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 13
November 1, 2021: Roll 11
- Yeas: 103
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor