+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2020-76)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on March 12, 2020 at 12:14 p.m. on March 12, 2020.
- Assigned Act No. 2020-76.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 365
- Third Reading Passed
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 200
- Third Reading Passed
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2020: Roll 365
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
March 5, 2020: Roll 200
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 76
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor