+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Further Consideration
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Albritton motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Mooney intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 200
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 199
- Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2017: Roll 199
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
March 9, 2017: Roll 200
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor