+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1239
- Third Reading Passed
- Signature Requested
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 689
- Third Reading Passed
- Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered
- Conflict of Interest filed
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 690
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 691
- Cosponsors Added
- Engrossed
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Votes (5)
May 17, 2017: Roll 1239
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
May 2, 2017: Roll 689
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 24
May 2, 2017: Roll 690
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 24
May 2, 2017: Roll 691
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 40
May 2, 2017: Roll 692
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 84
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor