+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-136)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 3:16 p.m. on March 16, 2021.
- Assigned Act No. 2021-136.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 497
- Third Reading Passed
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 60
- Third Reading Passed
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2021: Roll 497
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
February 10, 2021: Roll 60
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 51
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor