+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Dial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-518.
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Dial motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 62
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 20
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
+ − Votes (2)
August 10, 2015: Roll 62
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 7
August 5, 2015: Roll 20
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor