+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Weaver filed a Conflict of Interest Declaration
- Enrolled
- Patterson motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 980
- Concurrence Requested
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pittman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1094
- Third Reading Passed
- Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1093
- Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
- Ward first Substitute Offered
- Pittman Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1096
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1097
- Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1095
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 556
- Third Reading Passed
- INS 1st Amendment Offered
- INS 2nd Amendment Offered
- Cosponsors Added
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 557
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 558
- Pringle Conflict of Interest Declaration Filed
- Engrossed
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
May 18, 2017: Roll 980
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2017: Roll 1094
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 4
May 16, 2017: Roll 1095
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2017: Roll 1096
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2017: Roll 1097
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2017: Roll 1093
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
April 20, 2017: Roll 557
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 7
April 20, 2017: Roll 558
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 5
April 20, 2017: Roll 559
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 33
April 20, 2017: Roll 556
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor