+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Further Consideration
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- JUDY 3rd Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- JUDY 1st Amendment Offered
- JUDY 2nd Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 865
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 863
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 864
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 866
- Engrossed
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2018: Roll 863
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 47
March 15, 2018: Roll 864
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 46
March 15, 2018: Roll 865
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 46
March 15, 2018: Roll 866
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 47
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor