+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over
- Tourism and Marketing first Substitute Offered
- Reed motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Further Consideration
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Commerce and Small Business Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 817
- Knight Amendment Offered
- Faulkner motion to Table lost Roll Call 818
- Faulkner motion to Table lost Roll Call 819
- Faulkner motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Open
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 843
- Alexander Amendment Offered
- Faulkner motion to Table adopted Roll Call 844
- Alexander and Jackson intended to vote "Nay"
- Hall Amendment Offered
- Faulkner motion to Table adopted Roll Call 845
- Rogers Amendment Offered
- Faulkner motion to Table adopted Roll Call 846
- Faulkner motion to motion to remove from table alexander amendment adopted Roll Call 847
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 848
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 849
- Wilcox filed a Conflict of Interst Declaration
- Engrossed
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
May 4, 2017: Roll 817
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 19
May 4, 2017: Roll 818
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 51
- Present/NV: 18
May 4, 2017: Roll 819
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 47
- Present/NV: 23
May 4, 2017: Roll 843
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 47
May 4, 2017: Roll 844
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 21
May 4, 2017: Roll 845
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 45
May 4, 2017: Roll 846
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 48
May 4, 2017: Roll 847
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 51
May 4, 2017: Roll 848
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 51
May 4, 2017: Roll 849
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 36
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor