+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2013-200.
- Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 832
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 199
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 200
- Engrossed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 832
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 199
- Yeas: 97
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor