+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-249)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Assigned Act No. 2018-249 on 03/15/2018.
- Delivered to Governor at 4:32 p.m. on March 8, 2018.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 736
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 360
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2018: Roll 736
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
February 15, 2018: Roll 360
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor