+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-379)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:11 a.m. on April 29, 2021.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Banking and Insurance first Amendment Offered
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-379.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 996
- Concurrence Requested
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Elliott motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1074
- Banking and Insurance Amendment Offered
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1075
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 673
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 672
- Insurance Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 27, 2021: Roll 996
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 2
April 20, 2021: Roll 1074
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
April 20, 2021: Roll 1075
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
April 7, 2021: Roll 672
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 21
April 7, 2021: Roll 673
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor